CT SB00469 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commission on Enhancing Outcomes to submit an additional report on its findings.
Title
An Act Concerning The Commission On Enhancing Agency Outcomes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-21 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-08 | File Number 411 | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Calendar Number 267 | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-22 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-15 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |
2010-03-12 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |