CT SB00468 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioners of Energy and Environmental Protection and Transportation to (1) develop an inventory of land owned by the state near highways that they determine is suitable for the installation of certain Class I renewable energy sources, (2) establish appropriate setback distances for such sources, (3) develop and implement a plan concerning the financing and revenues related to such sources, and (4) adopt regulations, and require the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection to issue a request for proposals for such sources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Installation Of Class I Renewable Energy Sources On State Land Near Public Highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
2019-03-12SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-26SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-05SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback