CT SB00465 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-17-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-17-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To revise provisions regarding driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs, or both, and the applicability of ignition interlock device requirements, including, but not limited to, the applicability of such requirements to administrative "per se" violations, persons under the age of twenty-one and operators in this state with a conviction in another state.
Title
An Act Concerning Ignition Interlock Devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 287 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 324 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 324 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 14-228 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 530 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5409 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-24 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-15 | Senate | File Number 544 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 373 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |