CT SB00465 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require that newborns be screened for adrenoleukodystrophy.
Title
An Act Concerning Newborn Screening For Adrenoleukodystrophy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 387 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 369 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 369 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 13-242 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 646 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-23 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7708 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | File Number 107 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 152 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |