CT SB00464 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-04 - House Calendar Number 523
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-04 - House Calendar Number 523
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that a clinical laboratory administers a hair follicle drug test when such a test has ordered by a licensed physician, physician assistant or advanced practice registered nurse.
Title
An Act Concerning The Administration Of Hair Follicle Drug Testing By Clinical Laboratories.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 280 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-04 | Senate | House Calendar Number 523 |
2014-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-02 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2014-04-08 | Senate | File Number 433 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 285 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |