CT SB00456 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - File Number 370
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - File Number 370
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure residents of the state have access to clean and safe well water.
Title
An Act Concerning Clean And Safe Well Water.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Tammy Nuccio [R] | Rep. Jaime Foster [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] |
Rep. Eleni Kavros DeGraw [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | File Number 370 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 269 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |