CT SB00452 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 600
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 600
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) remove the ability of boards of assessment appeals to elect not to conduct an appeal for certain types of properties, (2) require assessors to provide certain information before a board of assessment appeals hearing, (3) provide for mediation before a court may hear an appeal of the action of a board of tax review or a board of assessment appeals, (4) increase the valuation threshold for when an appraisal must be filed with the court for an appeal related to the valuation of real property, and (5) replace the existing penalty related to the submission of income and expenses information by rental property owners with a penalty of five hundred dollars.
Title
An Act Concerning The Property Tax Appeals Process And The Penalty Related To The Submission Of Income And Expenses Information For Rental Properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | File Number 600 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 354 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/01 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |