CT SB00449 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - File Number 486
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - File Number 486
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a revenue stream dedicated to the use of the rainy day fund, debt payments and contributions to public pension plans, by segregating any increases in personal income tax attributable to increases in capital gains, dividends and interest income received by taxpayers.
Title
An Act Concerning Computation Of Data Relating To Revenue Volatility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | File Number 486 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 306 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |