CT SB00445 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To improve the quality of life for Connecticut residents by establishing a Connecticorps program that will harness student energy, creativity and skills to support vital state and nonprofit programs.
Title
An Act Concerning A Plan For The Connecticorps Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 313 (Y: 127 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 222 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 222 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Special Act 15-11 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Passed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 583 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-08 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Commerce |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce |
2015-03-26 | Senate | File Number 253 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 201 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |