CT SB00437 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 399
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 399
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To modify the appointment process for the Child Advocate and to create an independent board within the advocate's office with the responsibility of appointing the advocate.
Title
An Act Concerning The Structure Of The Office Of The Child Advocate Within The Office Of Governmental Accountability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | File Number 399 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 261 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |