CT SB00437 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - House Calendar Number 423
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - House Calendar Number 423
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To impose a tax on noncigarette smoking tobacco that is equal to the tax on cigarettes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Tobacco Products Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 180 PASS (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | House Calendar Number 423 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-14 | File Number 543 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Calendar Number 390 | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-01 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-11 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |