CT SB00436 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - House Calendar Number 493
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - House Calendar Number 493
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To promote public-private partnerships to support the cost-efficient delivery of human services.
Title
An Act Promoting Public-private Partnerships For The Cost-efficient Delivery Of Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 130 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 142 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 142 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 493 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | File Number 339 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 211 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |