CT SB00435 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) establish requirements for clinical pathways used by health carriers, (2) specify the disclosures required regarding such clinical pathways, health carriers' use of such clinical pathways and financial incentives offered or provided by health carriers to prescribing practitioners for participation in a clinical pathways program, and (3) require health insurance policies to subject covered services rendered by a chiropractor to terms and conditions that are no less favorable than when such covered services are rendered by a physician.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Of Health Carriers' Use Of Clinical Pathways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-04 | Senate | File Number 452 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 301 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |