CT SB00433 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To discourage the sale of fraudulent event tickets via the internet.
Title
An Act Concerning Sanctions For The Sale Of Fraudulent Event Tickets Via The Internet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-25 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-04 | Senate | File Number 225 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 142 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |