CT SB00433 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - House Calendar Number 533
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - House Calendar Number 533
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish the burden of proof in tax appeals.
Title
An Act Concerning The Burden Of Proof In Tax Appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 360 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | House Calendar Number 533 | |
2010-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-05-05 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | |
2010-05-05 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-21 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-13 | File Number 531 | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Calendar Number 337 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-25 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-11 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |