CT SB00432 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To decrease the time limit for cemetery lot resales due to unpaid charges.
Title
An Act Concerning The Sale Of Abandoned Or Unused Cemetery Lots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 129 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 141 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 129 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 141 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Public Act 18-87 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 492 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4114 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | File Number 224 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 141 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |