CT SB00421 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - File Number 369
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - File Number 369
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that paid sick days are included under the standard wage.
Title
An Act Concerning Standard Wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | File Number 369 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 268 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |