CT SB00420 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 265
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 265
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize municipalities to adopt an ordinance regarding illegally passing a school bus.
Title
An Act Concerning Illegally Passing A School Bus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | File Number 265 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 191 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |