CT SB00415 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 393
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 393
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical changes to provisions concerning filing deadlines for certain appeals to the Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | File Number 393 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 255 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |