CT SB00411 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 302
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 302
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that temporary state employees are considered part of the same collective bargaining unit as permanent employees in similarly situated positions.
Title
An Act Concerning Temporary State Employees And Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | File Number 302 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 222 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |