CT SB00411 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To update the insurance statutes concerning insurance holding company systems to enhance the Insurance Department's financial surveillance and oversight of insurance companies.
Title
An Act Concerning The Insurance Holding Company System Regulatory Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | House Insurance and Real Estate Committee | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 146 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-23 | Public Act 12-103 | |
2012-05-08 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-20 | House Calendar Number 430 | |
2012-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-18 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3186 | |
2012-04-05 | File Number 284 | |
2012-04-05 | Senate Calendar Number 226 | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-30 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-20 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-09 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |