CT SB00406 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Motion Failed JF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Motion Failed JF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To waive certain insurance requirements in order to allow the Fairmont Neighborhood Association to participate in a beautification program, and to hold the Commissioner of Transportation and the state harmless in the event anyone is injured while participating in such program.
Title
An Act Requiring The Commissioner Of Transportation To Waive Certain Insurance Requirements For Beautification Efforts On State Property Along A Highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Motion Failed JF | |
2012-04-24 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-18 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2012-04-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2012-04-03 | File Number 244 | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Calendar Number 207 | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-27 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-19 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-12 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |