CT SB00400 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - File Number 422
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - File Number 422
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure the provision of quality services to persons with intellectual disability.
Title
An Act Concerning Graduate Funding And The Provision Of Support And Services For Persons With Intellectual Disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | File Number 422 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 247 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |