CT SB00397 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the maximum annual modification to Connecticut adjusted gross income for contributions to qualified state tuition programs to five thousand dollars for each child of an individual taxpayer filing and ten thousand dollars for each child of taxpayers filing a joint return.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Higher Education Trust.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |