CT SB00396 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require (1) the Child Advocate to serve as chairperson of the child fatality review panel, (2) such panel to assess the adequacy of the Department of Children and Families' policies and practices and the compliance by department personnel with such policies and practices, and (3) such panel to present its annual report at an informational forum.
Title
An Act Concerning The Child Fatality Review Panel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-16 | Senate | File Number 80 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 82 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |