CT SB00395 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - File Number 222
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - File Number 222
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow the Department of Consumer Protection to suspend alcoholic liquor permits of employers that have committed wage theft and to ban the enforcement of a regulation prohibiting the issuance of an alcoholic liquor permit to an applicant who is unable to read and understand English.
Title
An Act Concerning Wage Theft And Alcoholic Liquor Permit Nonrenewal And English Language Requirements For The Issuance Of Alcoholic Liquor Permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | File Number 222 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 171 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |