CT SB00394 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To reconstitute the board of directors of the Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority.
Title
An Act Concerning The Inspection Of Land For Use As An Ash Residue Facility By Certain State Quasi-public Agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Leroy Frantz [R] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | Sen. Jonathan Harris [D] |
Rep. Susan Johnson [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | House Planning and Development Committee | Sen. Edith Prague [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 368 PASS AS AMND BY SEN A, HOU A (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 259 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 259 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-20 | Public Act 10-140 | |
2010-05-05 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-04 | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2010-05-04 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-04 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-04 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5498 | |
2010-05-04 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-01 | House Calendar Number 493 | |
2010-05-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-05-01 | Immediate Transmittal to the House | |
2010-05-01 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-01 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4669 | |
2010-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-20 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-04-08 | File Number 403 | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Calendar Number 277 | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-22 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/10 | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |