CT SB00393 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - House Calendar Number 513
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - House Calendar Number 513
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish certain standards for contracts between health care providers and insurers.
Title
An Act Concerning Standards In Health Care Provider Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 292 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | House Calendar Number 513 | |
2010-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-05-03 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | |
2010-05-03 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4803 | |
2010-03-30 | File Number 207 | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Calendar Number 143 | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-05 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |