CT SB00390 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 476
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 476
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that certain felony violations of election laws shall carry a penalty of a minimum term of imprisonment of twelve months that may not be suspended or reduced.
Title
An Act Concerning Penalties For Certain Election Crimes.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. Greg Howard [R] | Rep. Gale Mastrofrancesco [R] |
Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Rep. Francis Cooley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | File Number 476 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 281 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |