CT SB00385 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - File Number 391
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To (1) increase the fee remitted to municipalities in which certain moving violations occur from fifteen dollars to twenty dollars, (2) reduce the number of the points charged against the holder of a motor vehicle operator's license if the holder participates in a motor vehicle operator's retraining program, and (3) allow for the issuance or renewal of a motor vehicle operator's license of a person who has an infraction or moving violation that is ten or more years old.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Moving Violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateFile Number 391
2018-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 222
2018-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-03SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-23SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/14
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback