CT SB00383 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 349
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 349
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a mitigation fund to make payments to individuals or entities harmed by adverse impacts to fisheries and wildlife from offshore wind power facilities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Effect Of Offshore Wind Facilities On State Fisheries.
Sponsors
House Energy and Technology Committee | Rep. Aundre Bumgardner [R] | Rep. Devin Carney [R] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | File Number 349 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 234 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |