CT SB00380 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To promote mental health and wellness training and suicide prevention for police officers in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Use Of Force And Pursuits By Police And Increasing Police Accountability And Transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 344 SENATE AMD A (Y: 89 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 345 AS AMENDED (Y: 86 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 243 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 10039 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 250 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-19SenatePublic Act 19-90
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-31SenateHouse Calendar Number 684
2019-05-31SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-29SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-29SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-29SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10039
2019-04-23SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-23SenateNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-23SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-22SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-10SenateFile Number 590
2019-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 298
2019-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-03-19SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-03-01SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-07SenatePublic Hearing 02/11
2019-02-01SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00380&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00380-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00380-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00380-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00380-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00090-R00SB-00380-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00380-R00PH-CV21-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00380-R00PH-CV149-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00380-R00PH-CV173-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00380-R00JUD-CV196-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00250-R00SB00380-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00243-R00SB00380-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00345-R00SB00380-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00344-R00SB00380-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback