CT SB00380 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - House Calendar Number 511
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - House Calendar Number 511
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To direct the Commissioner of Education to use unexpended funds for providing professional development to school readiness staff.
Title
An Act Concerning Early Childhood Education Credentialing For School Readiness Programs For 2015.
Sponsors
Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D] | Rep. Michelle Cook [D] | House Education Committee | Sen. Thomas Gaffey [D] |
Rep. Toni Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 306 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | House Calendar Number 511 | |
2010-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-05-03 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | |
2010-05-03 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4652 | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4509 | |
2010-04-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-21 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |
2010-04-21 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-21 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-21 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |
2010-04-07 | File Number 351 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Calendar Number 223 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |