CT SB00376 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for certain prosthetic devices.
Title
An Act Concerning Health Insurance Coverage For Prosthetic Devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 224 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 224 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Public Act 18-69 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Passed |
2018-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 543 |
2018-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-01 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-09 | Senate | File Number 335 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 207 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |