CT SB00367 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 329
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 329
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To study ways to maximize Medicaid reimbursement for The University of Connecticut Health Center.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study To Maximize Medicaid Reimbursement For Uconn Health Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 67 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 329 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | File Number 263 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 189 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |