CT SB00365 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make it a class D felony to report elder abuse fraudulently or maliciously and to require a person making a report of abuse of an elderly person previously investigated by the Department of Social Services to provide evidence as to the potential abuse.
Title
An Act Concerning Investigations By Protective Services For The Elderly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 339 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 326 PASS AS AMENDED BY SENATE A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 326 PASS AS AMENDED BY SENATE A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-224 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-03 | House Calendar Number 587 | |
2011-06-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6413 | |
2011-05-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-16 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-05-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-12 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-11 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-23 | File Number 156 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Calendar Number 144 | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-17 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |
2011-02-17 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2011-02-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services | |
2011-02-03 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |
2011-01-27 | Public Hearing 02/01 | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |