CT SB00364 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - House Calendar Number 478
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - House Calendar Number 478
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide notification to the Chief State's Attorney of the death of an individual in the care or custody of a state agency or department.
Title
An Act Concerning Notification To The State's Attorney Of The Death Of A Person In State Custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 148 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 478 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | File Number 325 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 243 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |