CT SB00361 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - House Calendar Number 500
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - House Calendar Number 500
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit criminal defendants who have physical custody of a minor child to provide the court with a family impact statement prior to sentencing for a crime for which a sentence of imprisonment may be imposed.
Title
An Act Concerning Family Impact Statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 254 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 4842 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 252 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4843 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 4842 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 252 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4843 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Calendar Number 500 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 4842 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4843 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4779 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | File Number 424 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 284 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |