CT SB00356 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase executive and legislative oversight of quasi-public agency contracts by requiring the submission of certain contracts to the Attorney General and relevant legislative committee.
Title
An Act Requiring Executive And Legislative Review Of Certain Quasi-public Agency Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |