CT SB00349 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - File Number 427
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - File Number 427
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure individuals who are incarcerated are screened for dyslexia.
Title
An Act Concerning Dyslexia Screening Of Individuals Who Are Incarcerated.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Mitch Bolinsky [R] |
Sen. Herron Gaston [D] | Rep. Maryam Khan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | File Number 427 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 263 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |