CT SB00347 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Joint Favorable
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To establish state medical loss ratios for individual health insurance policies and group health insurance policies for small employers that will become effective if the federal medical loss ratios for such policies are repealed or rendered ineffective by operation of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Patient Protection And Affordable Care Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateJoint Favorable
2020-03-02SenatePublic Hearing 03/05
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback