CT SB00344 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - File Number 164
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - File Number 164
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To disregard from income certain federal veterans' benefits when determining eligibility for certain public assistance programs.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Federal Veterans' Benefits And Income Eligibility Determinations For Certain Public Assistance Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | File Number 164 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 129 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' and Military Affairs |