CT SB00336 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-10 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-10 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a minimum fine for negligent hunting in the second and third degree.
Title
An Act Concerning Negligent Hunting And Trespassing For Purposes Of Hunting, Trapping Or Fishing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-29 | File Number 165 | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Calendar Number 169 | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-02 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |