CT SB00334 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - File Number 674
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - File Number 674
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To revise the amount of reimbursement received by an employer that has paid workers' compensation benefits to an injured employee when the employee brings an action against a third-party tortfeasor and recovers damages.
Title
An Act Concerning The Resolution Of Claims Involving Workers' Compensation Claims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | File Number 674 | |
2010-04-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-30 | New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2010-04-30 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-27 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/03/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-27 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-04-21 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |
2010-04-15 | File Number 577 | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Calendar Number 399 | |
2010-04-15 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-29 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-29 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Public Hearing 03/24 | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |