CT SB00328 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - File Number 554
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - File Number 554
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require the Commissioner of Developmental Services to develop a strategic plan to reduce the wait time for persons with intellectual disability for services from the department, (2) require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to consult with stakeholders on any plan to close a facility operated by the Department of Developmental Services, (3) require the Department of Developmental Services to provide notice when the eligibility of a person with intellectual disability to receive state-assisted care will end, (4) allow the Department of Social Services to contract with hospitals and nonprofit organizations to provide social services and referrals to frequent patients of hospital services, and (5) establish a task force to study the Department of Developmental Services' level of need assessment system.
Title
An Act Concerning The Provision Of Developmental And Social Services In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | File Number 554 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 332 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |