CT SB00327 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 327
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 327
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study the effects of hate speech on children.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study The Effects Of Hate Speech And Bullying On Children.
Sponsors
House Committee on Children | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Kadeem Roberts [D] | Rep. Sarah Keitt [D] |
Rep. Devin Carney [R] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 61 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 327 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3782 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | File Number 120 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 106 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |