CT SB00326 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To protect consumers from unfair business practices.
Title
An Act Concerning Connecticut's Egg Statutes And Requiring The Establishment Of A Standard Of Care For Animal Importers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 424 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 345 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 345 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 13-241 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,C |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,C |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 623 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-21 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,C |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 7483 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7473 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7420 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Environment |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-26 | Senate | File Number 146 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 164 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |