CT SB00324 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a working group to review Title 7 of the general statutes.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Title 7 Of The General Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 142 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 125 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 125 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Special Act 22-4 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 379 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | File Number 313 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 232 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |