CT SB00324 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/22
Pending: Joint Joint Committee on Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/22
Pending: Joint Joint Committee on Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent a Department of Children and Families processing delay from allowing a foster child to go on vacation with their foster family.
Title
An Act Concerning Vacations For Foster Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | |
2011-02-10 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |