CT SB00312 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 326
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 326
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To update statutes concerning work opportunities for persons with a disability or a disadvantage.
Title
An Act Concerning A Janitorial Work Program For Persons With A Disability And Persons With A Disadvantage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 66 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 326 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | File Number 255 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 181 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |